Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Simonyan Varouj, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert L. Starr Law Offices Of, against Texas Automobile Leasing, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc., represented by Alston & Bird Llp, Beatty & Myers Llp, Bowman And Brooke Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lee Smalley Edmon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryOthr Breach Contr/Warr-Not Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time794 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 322, Lee Smalley Edmon, Presiding Status Conference (Notice of settlement entireaction filed 12/7/12) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Lee Smalley Edmon |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal ( entire action w/prejudice ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 309, Anthony J. Mohr, Presiding Status Conference - Held-Continued Judge: Anthony J. Mohr |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management (for Texas Automobile Leasing and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. [on December 13, 2012 in Department 309] ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 309, Anthony J. Mohr, Presiding Initial Status Conference - Court makes order Judge: Anthony J. Mohr |
|
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 309, Anthony J. Mohr, Presiding Initial Status Conference (==================================Cont. to 10/9 @2:30) - Continued by Court Judge: Anthony J. Mohr |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management (for Plaintiff Varouj Simonyan ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.