Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maldonado Evangelina, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Munoz Sandra C. Esq., against Optometry Vision One, Nicholson Carl, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management157 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time653 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OP COURTS RULING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND COURTS SE[ING OF STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Evangelina Maldonado (Plaintiff) |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 74 Status Conference (Status Conference; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.