Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bermundez Maria, Guapo Beatrice, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Biggins Chad Esq., against Fluxus Llc, Knit Resource Llc, Paquette Martin, U.S. Manufacturing Llc, represented by Erikson David Alden Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Brian S. Currey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management190 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2010 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions763 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time450 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION AND NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 44 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Debtor Failed to Appear) - |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Creditor |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill After Judgment Filed by Creditor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.