Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kim Soon Joo, Ksjk Family Limited Partnership The, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Carlson Mark C. Esq., Robert K. Lee Esq., Yang Seung Esq., against Central Pacific Bank, Chino Starbucks Llc, Choi Paul, Does 1 Through 100, Good Hill Inc., (total of 8) See All represented by Carlson Law Group Inc., Katherine S. Ritchey, Lombardi Thomas E. Esq., Pircher Nicholas & Meeks, Urbach Matthew S. Esq., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ernest Hiroshige presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 29, 2010 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions45 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time774 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (w/prejudice as to complaint and entire aciton ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding Jury Trial - Case Deemed Settled Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding Final Status Conference - Completed Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 8 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 7 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.