Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Zargari Nemat, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cruz Leonard G. Esq., against Plong Vannadeth, Naturally Divine Wellness Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management269 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions177 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Further Proceedings Terry Green 8:45 am | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 14 (Further Proceedings; Off Calendar) - (Further Proceedings; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-11-07 00:00:00 | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 14 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 14 Unknown Event Type |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 14 (Further Proceedings; Off Calendar) - |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE FAILURE OF VANNADETH PLONG TO APPEAR AT JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION | |
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng Terry Green 8:45 am | |
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2013-10-22 00:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.