Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez Pedro, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Evans Charles, against Jp Morgan Chase Bank Na, Federal National Mortgage Association, California Reconveyance Company, represented by Yoo S. Christopher Esq., Lee James T. Esq., Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder And Weiss, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time283 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PEN DENCY OF ACTION | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Pedro Rodriguez (Plaintiff) |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Pedro Rodriguez (Plaintiff) |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 52 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING R: ORDER 10 SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.