Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Schauerman Anne M. Esq., against Karlis John C., K&M Construction, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 19, 2010 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Creditor |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMFNT | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Creditor |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 14 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); No Appearance) - |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE LOST ORIGINAL DOCUMENT, ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.