Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maxwell-Jolly David Director Of The, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bruguera Paul S., against Karadjian Peter, Karadjian Patrick The Estate Of, Karadjian Kay, Karadjian Gegouni, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management158 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2010 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time284 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING OF CONTINUED HEARING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL | |
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conference Date Filed by Maxwell-Jolly, David, Director of the (Plaintiff) |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.