Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Koehler Edem, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gaines Kenneth S. Esq., Miller Scott A., Miller Steven L. Esq., against Does 1 Through 50, Vxi Global Solutions Inc., represented by Kim Princeton H.Esq., K & L Gates Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Jane Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 19, 2010 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time931 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File - Public | |
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Related Cases (BC461884 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by VXI Global Solutions, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Edem Koehler (Plaintiff) |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Edem Koehler (Plaintiff) |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF PAYMENT OF COMPLEX FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 308 Initial Status Conference - Held |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 308, Jane Johnson, Presiding Initial Status Conference - Completed Judge: Jane Johnson |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (Complex fee Koehler, Edem ) Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.