Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DARRON PERKINS ET AL VS TYNAILDA MARQUISHA LOWE
On November 19, 2010 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 12 days
Time To Trial
11 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Jury Trial |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Final Status Conference |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Unknown Event Type |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Post-Mediation Status Conference |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Darron Perkins (Plaintiff); Willie Perkins (Plaintiff) |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement OF ENTIRE CASE | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Mediation Hearing Date Filed by Mediator |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) - |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Continued by Court) - |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Tynailda Marquisha Lowe (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Darron Perkins (Plaintiff); Willie Perkins (Plaintiff) |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Tynailda Marquisha Lowe (Defendant) |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Tynailda Marquisha Lowe (Defendant) |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Darron Perkins (Plaintiff); Willie Perkins (Plaintiff) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Darron Perkins (Plaintiff); Willie Perkins (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES |