Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALYSSA BACKLUND VS CHRISTOPHER STONE
On November 19, 2010 an other promissory note/collections case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Abraham Khan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
June 01, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Robert A;Category
Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
3 years and 15 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: BC449910 Hearing Date: June 10, 2024 Dept: 32 alyssa backlund, Plaintiff, v. christopher stone and ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS, LLC, Defendants. Case No.: BC449910 Hearing Date: June 10, 2024 ... | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Discharged) - |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO CCP 1021.5; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN RE: PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUIDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF STACIE SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D) | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; Matter continued) - |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; Continued by Court) - |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND/OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN [N SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) - |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICECIVIL | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT AND/OR DEFAULT JUSGMENT; AND DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) - |
|
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICECIVIL | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ATTACHMENTENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT) | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF DAMAGES | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | RULING RE: MOTION STRIKING ANSWERS OF DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER STONE AND ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS, LLC; | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC re Contempt; Court makes order) - |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ issued Filed by Clerk |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTTCE OF HEARING - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (Motion to Vacate; Off Calendar) - |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRECTED JUDGMENT | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ALYSSA BACKLUND'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION STRIKING ANSWERS OF DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER STONE AND ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mediator |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION AND OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR: DEFENDANT STONES PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 473 (B) | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Erik S. Esq. Syverson (Attorney) |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Other) - |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIK SYVERSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 473(B) | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT STONES NOTICE OF MOTION ANI) MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 473(B) | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | |
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ-Other Issued Filed by Clerk |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Clerk |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ-Other Issued Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice-Recusal-ADR Neutral Filed by Mediator |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADR NEUTRAL RECUSAL | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE: ATTORNEY FEE AND COST AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16(C) | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CROSSCOMPLAINT | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Granted |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | RULING RE: MOTION OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT ALYSSA BACKLUND TO RECOVER ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16(C) | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event | DIFINDANT CHRISTOPHER STONES OBJECTION TO: (1) PLAINTIFFS LATESERVED REPLY PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATFORNEYS FEES; AND ETC | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF MOTION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTTON FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS COMPLAINANT OPPOSITION TO BACKLUNDS MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CC 425.16(C) | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF Robert A. MOSIER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS COMPLAINANT OPPOSITION TO BACKLUNDS MOTION TO RECOVER ATFORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16(C) | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY TO DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO BACKLUNDS MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16(C) | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF EDIE MERMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF MOTION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF VINAY KOHLI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Status Conference - Held |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CCP 425.16(C) | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Status Conference (Status Conference; Continued by Court) - |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff); Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event | JOINT STATUS STATEMENT RE APPELLATE PROCEEDING | |
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Status Conference (Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference - Held |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO REPORTERS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | RULING RE: SPECIAL MOTION OF CROSSDEFENDANT TO STRIKE COMPLAINT. | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (Motion to Strike; Denied) - |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-DEFENDANT `S OBJECTIONS TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF CROSSA COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO CR0SS-DEFENDANT`S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTWFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16; [PROPOSED ORDER] | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSSCOMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 425.16 | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALYSSA BACKLUND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO CROSSDEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); STICKYDRAMA (Defendant) |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIK SYVEI{SON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER STONE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS- COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PARKER TAMMEN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CROSS- DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | DFCLARATION OF BRASON PORTERFIELD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CROSSDEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKI CROSS-COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS COM PLAINT | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTE1N IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-I)EFENDANIS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSSCOMPLAINT | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS TO CROSSCOMPLAINANTS EVII)ENCE ATTACHED AS EXHIBITS TO CROSS- COMPLAINT | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILC1VIL | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ALYSSA BACKLUND IN. SUPPORT OF CROSSDEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-CON1ILAINT | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); ELITE IMAGING CONCEPTS (Defendant) |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR (1) DEFAMATION PER SE; (2) INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; AND (3) INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAI NT | |
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | RULING RE: SPECIAL MOTION OF DEFENDANT TO STRIKE COMPLAINT; THEREOF; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IN THE SUM OF $16,890 PAYABLE 3Y PLAINTIFF ALYSSA BACKLUND | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Judge |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); STICKYDRAMA (Defendant) |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IN THE SUM OF $16,890 PAYABLE BY PLAINTIFF ALYSSA BACKLUND | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (Motion to Strike; Off Calendar) - |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); STICKYDRAMA (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE, C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F EDIE MERMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL PALZES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ANTISLAPP MOTION | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SI.JPPORT OF PLAINT WFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ANTI. SLAPP MOTION | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ALYSSA BACKLUND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ANTI-SLAPP MOTION | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIK SYVERSON IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRJEF TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF F. EDIE MERMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); STICKYDRAMA (Defendant) |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); STICKYDRAMA (Defendant) |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF F. EDLE MERMELSTELN IN SUPIORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ALYSSA BACKLUND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ERIK SYVERSON IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SRIDAVI GANESAN IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16 | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IN THE SUM OF $16,890 PAYABLE BY PLAINTIFF ALYSSA BACKL | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER STONE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKETHE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 425.I6 | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant) |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by Christopher Stone (Defendant); STICKYDRAMA (Defendant) |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NO11CF OF RELATED CASE | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT 1. DEFAMATION; ETC. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Alyssa Backlund (Plaintiff) |