Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ames Dawn, Arndt Franklin, Asan Shirley, Bandy Max, Black George, (total of 67) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Gruenwald Eric W., against Glaxosmithkline, Glaxosmithklinle Llc, Mckesson Corporation, Smithkline Beecham Corporation, represented by King & Spalding Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management109 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2010 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated (Non-Lead Case) |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 33 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Glaxosmithkline (Legacy Party); Smithkline Beecham Corporation (Legacy Party); McKesson Corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER COORDINATING ACTIONS WITH JCCP4578 | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; JURY DEMAND | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Glaxosmithkline (Legacy Party); Smithkline Beecham Corporation (Legacy Party); McKesson Corporation (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Elmer Canlas (Plaintiff); Dawn Ames (Plaintiff); Franklin Arndt (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.