Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
California Bank & Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ccts Llc, Stotelmyer Scott, Stotelmyer Teresa A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Joanne B. O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management60 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2010 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time292 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; Off Calendar) - |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 12 Status Conference |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE .I I II RI A 0 RAI RIA R A1RA. WI ,.4. II FLAI.H4K | |
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE AND EXONERATING PLAINTIFF'S AND RECEIVER'S BONDS, APPROVING RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT AND APPROVING RECEIVER'S FEES AND EXPENSES | |
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGENIENT CONFERENCE | |
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.