Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collect Access Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zee Tappan Esq., against Chu Hu Z., Chu Huzhe Zhe, Huzhe Chu, Chu Huzhe, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 19, 2010 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ - Return | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Filed by Collect Access LLC (Plaintiff) |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL - CIVIL | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Renewal of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Creditor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.