Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores Arthur, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Los Angeles County Board Of Supervisors, represented by Nelson & Fulton, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with James R. Dunn presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management271 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2010 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions388 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time381 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order - Dismissal Filed by Court |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 26 Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 26 Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Continued by Court) - |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Brief | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS TRIAL BRIEF | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors (Defendant) |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 26 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.