Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shackelford Alisa, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Green Noah, against Blue Shield Of California Life & Health, represented by Bauman Sharon B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rita Miller presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2010 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial368 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Jury Trial |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Final Status Conference |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Unknown Event Type |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.