Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Centinela Freeman Emergency Medical Asso-, Sherman Oaks Emergency Medical Associates, Valley Presbyterian Emergency Medical, Westside Emergency Medical Associates, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Selesnick Andrew Howard, against Aetna Health Of California Inc., Blue Cross Of California, California Physicians Service, Care 1St Health Plan, Cigna Healthcare Of California Inc., (total of 16) See All represented by Crowell & Moring Llp, Donovan William Patrick Jr, Johnson David D., Peterson Kurt Charles, Richardson Kuljurgis Heather Lynn, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John Shepard Wiley Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management175 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2010 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions166 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time3339 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of Case in its Entirety) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Yvette M. Palazuelos |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (re Order to Show Cause re Dismissal of All Remaining Defendants) - Held Judge: Yvette M. Palazuelos |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Order to Show Cause re Dismissa...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re Order to Show Cause re Dismissa...) of 12/28/2018) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Centinela Freeman Emergency Medical Asso- (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Yvette M. Palazuelos |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case) Filed by Centinela Freeman Emergency Medical Asso- (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance (of Status Conference) Filed by Centinela Freeman Emergency Medical Asso- (Plaintiff); Sherman Oaks Emergency Medical Associates (Plaintiff); Valley Presbyterian Emergency Medical (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-10-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.