Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lathrop Lauren E., filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Rehwald William Esq., against Spila Fernando, Patagonia Food Concepts Inc., Miller Colleen, Gil Fabian, Grill South Pint Argentina, (total of 5) See All represented by Goldstein Sarah K. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2010 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time220 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Lauren E. Lathrop (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.