Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALLY FINANCIAL INC VS JEANETTE L TRAINOR
On November 05, 2010 an other promissory note/collections case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Kevin C. Brazile presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 15, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 month and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 20 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-05-16 00:00:00 | |
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Kevin C. Brazile 8:30 am | |
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 20 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ally Financial Inc. (Plaintiff) Filed by Ally Financial Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 41 Days | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ally Financial Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTIC OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ally Financial Inc. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Ally Financial Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR (1) CLAIM AND DELIVERY OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, FOR PRE-LRIAL WRIT OF POSSESSION, AND ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER OF PERSONAL PROPERTY AND RESTRAINING ORDER; ETC. | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Other Promissory Note/Collections | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ally Financial Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR (1) CLAIM AND DELIVERY OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, FOR PRE-LRIAL WRIT OF POSSESSION, AND ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER OF PERSONAL PROPERTY AND RESTRAINING ORDER; ETC. |