Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Badillo Heights Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Catanzarite Kenneth J., against Covina The City Of, Covina Redevelopment Agency, represented by Ando Yuichiro Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 05, 2010 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time305 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) - |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER THEREON | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.