Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez Jenny Bc460008, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Oordt Javier Van, against Castro Soledad, Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor-, represented by Nourafchan Jenus K. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions564 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time724 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2012-11-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Defendant) - |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Lopez, Jenny (BC460008) (Plaintiff) |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Defendant) - |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2012-11-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2012-11-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.