Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jett Eric, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Dadgostar Hirad D. Esq., Alivandivafa Alireza, against Los Angeles County Of, represented by Collins Collins Muir & Stewart Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time550 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Eric Jett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 39 Unknown Event Type |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Eric Jett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Eric Jett (Plaintiff) |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 62 Unknown Event Type |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.