Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ASHLEY BRISENO VS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA LLC E
On November 05, 2010 an other employment complaint case (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 years, 1 month and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 49 (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 49 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 49 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 49 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 49 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 49 Unknown Event Type |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Matter continued) - |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) - |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Matter continued) - |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS Motion to Be Relieved as CounselCIVIL | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ord for Withdrawal as Attorney of Rec Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Matter continued) - |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Proceedings Stayed) - |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RE AMENDED DECLARATION OF ANN KANE SMITH IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED DECLARATION OF ANN KANE SMITH IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION ANI) Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel. | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion to Be Relieved as CounselCIVIL | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RE Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS Motion to Be Relieved as CounselCIVIL | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Ashley Briseno (Plaintiff) |
|
January 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Unknown Event Type |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant) |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant) |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant); Dennis, D.O. Harper (Defendant); American Laser Centers (Legacy Party) |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE O FSTAY OF PROCEEDINGS | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER T0 CONTINUE THE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE | |
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC'S AND AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR Motion for Summary Judgment, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant) |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC'S AND AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Summary Judgment, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant) |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant) |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE RF DEFENDANTS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC'S AND AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Summary Judgment, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Points and Authorities Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant) |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT DEFENDANTS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC'S AND AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S Motion for Summary Judgment, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC'S AND AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S Memorandum of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF THEIR Motion for Summary Judgment, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | DFFENDANTS AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC AND AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS Motion for Summary Judgment, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPUIA1ION FOR AN ORDER SETTING DEFENDANTS MO11ON FOR SUMMARY .JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY AI)JUI)ICATION FOR HEARLN( ON JANUARY 30, 2012, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF TRIAL ON FEBRUARY 14, 2912 | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE | |
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Ashley Briseno (Plaintiff) |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by American Laser Centers of California, LLC (Defendant); American Laser Centers, LLC (Defendant); Dennis, D.O. Harper (Defendant) et al. |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 23 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 Court Order - Held |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 (Order to Show Cause - Other; OSC Discharged) - |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | AMERICAN LASER CENTERS OF CALIFORNIA LECS ANSWER TO PLAINIIFIS COMIPLAINT | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | AIVLE RICAN LASER CENTERS, I4LC AIITL AMERICAN LASER CENIERS OF CALIFORNIA, LLCS CROSS COMPLAINT AGAINST PLAINTIFF ASHILEY BRISFNO FOR: (1) VIOLATION OF CAL. LABOR CODE 2865; ETC. | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | AMERICAN LASER CENTERS, LLC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Ashley Briseno (Plaintiff) |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CONSTRUCTIVE TERRNINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |