Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mendoza Jorge Armando, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Climb Work Activity Center, Climb Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2010 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time420 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Unknown Event Type |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 (Order to Show Cause; Proceeding continued) - |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND PHONE AND FACSIMILE NUMBERS OF DEFENDANTS COUNSEL | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Proceeding continued) - |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.