Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First American Title Insurance Company, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Garrett Robert Esq., against Mintz Eric, Goldsmith & Hull, represented by Cole Jonathan B. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 22, 2010 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Case Deemed Settled) - |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS OFFER TO COMPROMISE (CCP 998) | |
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) - |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.