Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Xxxxx Xxxxxx W., filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Kermani Ray Law Office Of, against Tmz Productions Inc., Levin Harvey, Does 1 Through 50, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2009 |
CategoryDefamation (Slander/Libel) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed Judge: Edward A. Ferns |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE: COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.