Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fregoso Adela, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Setareh Shaun, Thierman Mark R. Esq., against Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable Services Llc, Time Warner Inc., represented by Fisher & Phillips Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2009 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Filed by Clerk |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Time Warner Cable Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Report Filed by Time Warner Cable Services LLC (Defendant) |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.