Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hollywood At Western Lp, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Abb Wayne M. Esq., against Does 1 To 10, Coldstone Creamery Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryUd/Commercial (Not Drugs/Evict) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeOther Judgment |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Partial Judgment (not entire case) (FOR POSSESSION ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ issued (Los Angeles County(poss. only) ) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (AS COLDSTONE CREAMERY, INC., AN ARIZONA CORP ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.