Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez Francisco, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Notkoff Arnold, against Sheriff'S Lawlea, Sanchez, Montaya, L.A. County Sheriff'S Dept., Does 1 To 100, (total of 8) See All represented by Hurrell Thomas C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ronald M. Sohigian presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2009 |
CategoryIntentional Pi/Pd/Wd (Eg. Assault) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time289 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (1st sana filed, mediation ended in full agreement. ) Filed by Mediator |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 41, Ronald M. Sohigian, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Ronald M. Sohigian |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF COMPLIANCE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order (RE TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL PREPARTATION ) Filed by Court |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 41, Ronald M. Sohigian, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Completed Judge: Ronald M. Sohigian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.