Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nez Linda C., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Robinson Jackie, represented by Yeager Kenneth Charles Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ernest Hiroshige presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time442 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding Jury Trial - Off Calendar Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE/ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding Final Status Conference - Completed Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - MSC held/Not settled. Trial stands Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding Conference-Case Management (OSC RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL) - Completed Judge: Ernest Hiroshige |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.