Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez Arturo Chia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lee Brad Esq., against Italian Interior Design, Does 1 To 20, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time276 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - OSC Discharged Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Matter continued Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien (PURSUANT TO CODE S 3850-3864 AND REQUEST TO BE PLACED ON PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL HEARINGS, PLEADINGS AND/OR DISCOVERY IN THIS ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Vacated Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR ITALIAN-#5.28 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Matter continued Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.