Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lin Hong Esquire, filed a(n) Racketeering - Torts case against Alhambra City Of, Cafe Op, Casey'S Irish Bar & Grill, Certain Underwriters At Lloyds Of London, Claimbox.Com, (total of 14) See All represented by Lederer David J. Esq., Lederer & Nojima Llp, Montes Joseph M. Esq., Soltman Levitt Flaherty & Wattles Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rita Miller presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryRacketeering (Rico) Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions291 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeRacketeering |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time331 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Rita Miller 9:30 am | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Rita Miller 9:00 am | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2010-10-27 00:00:00 | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 16 Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Rita Miller 8:45 am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.