Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barnett Stanley, Gary Roderick, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mason Reginald P. Esq., against Desanchez Blanca A., Does 1 Through 20, Gmac Mortgage Llc, Greenpoint Mortgage Funding Inc, Sanchez Jovel O., (total of 6) See All represented by Mcclendon Regina J. Esq., Severson & Werson A Professional Corp., Treadwell James H. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions212 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time857 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien (AMENDED ) Filed by Judgment Creditor |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Off Calendar Judge: Mel Red Recana |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal (entire action with prejudice ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Mel Red Recana |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF LIENS AGAINST REGINALD MASON, ESQ. AND MASON & MASON, LLP ) Filed by Judgment Creditor |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding Jury Trial - Court makes order Judge: Mel Red Recana |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 26, James R. Dunn, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Case Deemed Settled at Settle Conf Judge: James R. Dunn |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging (of lodging depo transcript ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Brief (reply ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.