Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sarasota Ccm Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Brian N. Esq., against Does 1 To 10, Jin Feng Chun, Woodstone Trade, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert H. O'Brien presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 17, 2009 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time250 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, Robert H. O'Brien, Presiding Conference-Case Management (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TOOBTAIN DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT) - Off Calendar Judge: Robert H. O'Brien |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Completed Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Matter continued Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.