Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith Christopher A., Havran Cynthia Lynne, filed a(n) Civil Rights (General Jurisdiction) case against Hayes Patrick, Does 1 To 100, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 10, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Rights (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time166 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding Order to Show Cause (OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TOAPPEAR AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE) - Court makes order Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 38, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Matter continued Judge: MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ord-App/Waiver Court Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.