Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Greystone Equipment Finance Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Mccurnin Thomas E. Esq., against Acropolis Ventures Inc., Amc Environmental Services Co., Does 1 Through 10, Pitsicalis Andrew, Titsicalis Andrew, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Joanne O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 10, 2009 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default (as to Flora Tumanyan aka Flora Yezegelyan; AMC Environmental Services Co., a California corp.; Acropolis Ventures corp. dba Flashoutlet.com...; Andrew Pitsicalis..; reject-#3,5,12,13) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 37, Joanne O'Donnell, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Req Ent of Def (&/or def judg or, case mgmt conf) - Case Dismissed/Disposed Judge: Joanne O'Donnell |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 37, Joanne O'Donnell, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Req Ent of Def (& Default/Judgment or, C/M/Conf.;) - Matter continued Judge: Joanne O'Donnell |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (FLORA TUMANYAN AKA FLORA YEZEGELVAN AND AMC ENVIROMENTAL SERVICES CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (re proof of service of osc hearing ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Filed by Clerk |
|
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.