Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Levine Leichtman Capital Partners Iii, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Taitelman Michael A., against Wallner Nicholas, Mealing Donald R., Hasney Lynn, represented by Verano Hugh T. Jr. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rex Heeseman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management152 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2008 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time510 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Levine Leichtman Capital Partners III, (Plaintiff) |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Unknown Event Type |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE | |
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NICHOLAS WALLNER | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Nicholas Wallner (Defendant) |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.