Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bek Ki, Kim Han Na, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Lee Frank N. Esq., Lim Young S. Esq., against B & Y Lp, Kim Bo Whan, Lee Hyeon Sook, Kim Bo Hwan, Kim Bowhan Whan, (total of 5) See All represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Irving S. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 12, 2007 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions512 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time475 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 47 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 47 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 47 Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Ki Bek (Plaintiff); Han Na Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Han Na Kim (Plaintiff) |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.