Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Elomina Chito, Elomina Arcie, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Wolf Marvin Louis Esq., against Los Angeles City Of, Archdiocese Of Los Angeles, represented by Sullivan Daniel R. Esq., Mclurkin Thomas C. Deputy City Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management134 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions494 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time524 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Court Order - Held |
|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Court Order - Held |
|
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant) |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.