Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Camargo Francisco, Guardado Blanca E. Amaya, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ellis Andrew L. & Associates Law O O, against Gillman Debbi L., Gillman Gary, Honeycutt Tear Off Doe 2, Huppert Construction Company Doe 1, Morrow Rita, (total of 6) See All represented by Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuck & Lebovits, Michelman & Robinson, Prindle Decker & Amaro Llp, Siegel Gil Todd Esq., Snyder & Dorenfeld Llp, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ernest M. Hiroshige presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial615 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time603 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 54 Jury Trial |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 54 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Blanca E. Amaya Guardado (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Blanca E. Amaya Guardado (Plaintiff) |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.