Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cheli Distribution Center Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cohen David M. Esq., against Izenman Yehuda Zvi, Marketing & Development Apparel Group, Schetritt Gerard Haim, Izenman Yudi, Schetritt Gerry Scheer, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management141 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial669 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Case Cycle Time439 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Creditor |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Renewal of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REJECTION MISCELLANEOUS JUDGMENTS | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Creditor |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Jury Trial |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Final Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.