Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pace Roderick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Arter Lee C. Esq., against Takhsangi Mojgan, represented by Perkins James J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions377 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time326 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior) - |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Roderick Pace (Plaintiff) |
|
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Roderick Pace (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.