Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marin David And Lucina, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Michels Philip Esq., against White Memorial Medical Center, represented by Rushfeldt Shelley & Drake Law O O, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rolf M. Treu presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time395 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.