Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Strong Anna, Lerner Steve C O Howard Dyment Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dempsey Michael D. Esq., against Checchio Joseph, represented by Husband Bertram Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David L. Minning presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management156 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time480 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON DEMURRER | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Anna Strong (Plaintiff); Lerner, Steve c/o/ Howard Dyment LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Joseph Checchio (Defendant) |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 61 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Demurrer sustained without leave) - |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF B. PAUL HUSBAND | |
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply/Response Filed by Joseph Checchio (Defendant) |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Joseph Checchio (Defendant) |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE, ETC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.