Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paul W. Speer Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Lubka Laurence P. Esq., against 8500 Steller Llc, represented by Greenberg Traurig Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard L. Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2007-12-03 00:00:00 | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 15 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Richard L. Fruin 9:30 am | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 15 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 15 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2007-11-26 00:00:00 | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Richard L. Fruin 8:30 am | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 15 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.