Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sadeghi Harry Esq., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bradley Jeannel, California Department Of Transportation, Figueroa Ernesto, Flynn Chris, Gonzales Paul, (total of 10) See All represented by Egan Audrey, Rim Susan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time753 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Certified Copy Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 45 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 45 Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Denied) - |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department 45 Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL, ETC. | |
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed by Harry, Esq. Sadeghi (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.