Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Direct Merchants Credit Card Bank, Hsbc Bank Nevada N.A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Jin Yi And Haesook Yi, Yi Haesook, Yi Jin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management469 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2006 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial680 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions910 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time969 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE/ FACSIMILE NUMBERS AND CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF COUNSEL | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMO COSTS SUMMARY | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.