Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pierfederici Faust, Heasman Justine, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Yates Chuck, Yates Charles Wallace Jr., represented by Jacobson Thomas N., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2006 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time529 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Post-Arbitration Status Conference (Conference-Post Arbitration Status; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Charles Wallace Jr. Yates (Defendant) |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.