Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crisanto Margarita, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Lee Mark E., against Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor-, represented by Gansert Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John Shepard Wiley Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2006 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time275 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant) |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant) |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Status Report Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant) |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Agreement (Full)) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.