Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Satbani Khalil, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Hollingsworth Stephen Charles, Horn Valerie Faith, Mokri Namvar A., Hollingsworth Stephen Charles Esq., against Charitable Foundation, Emrani Afshine, Encino Tarzana Hospital, Encino Tarzana Hospital Charitable, Gharavi Mohammed, (total of 12) See All represented by Drake Kenneth W. Esq., Drake Kenneth William, Fesler Donald Clark, Peterson George Ernest, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Irving Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management260 days |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2005 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions849 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time987 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department Q Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
(Request-Dismissal) Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION (Defendant); ENCINO TARZANA HOSPITAL (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Q (Motion-Compel; Granted) - |
|
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed by TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION (Defendant); ENCINO TARZANA HOSPITAL (Defendant) |
|
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien Filed by KHALIL SATBANI (Plaintiff) |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by KHALIL SATBANI (Plaintiff) |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Q Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Hearing Filed by TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION (Defendant); ENCINO TARZANA HOSPITAL (Defendant) |
|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by KHALIL SATBANI (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.